WV HB2314 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 42, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 42, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a family court judge to order a child to be taken into custody in emergency situations
Title
Authorizing a family court judge to order a child to be taken into custody in emergency situations
Sponsors
Del. Meshea Poore [D] | Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] | Del. Danny Wells [D] | Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] |
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 226) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 10) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 10) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 42, Acts, 2013 |
2013-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/22/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/13 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 226) |
2013-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2013-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 10) |
2013-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-02-13 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-13 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 6 | 9a | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 14 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |