WV HB2361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish certain requirements for dental insurance.
Title
Establishing certain requirements for dental insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB262 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - To Banking and Insurance
HB2754 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - To House Banking and Insurance
HB2754 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - To House Banking and Insurance