WV HB2365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to  clarify the definition of an employee for the purposes of unemployment compensation and workers’ compensation to match conform with Internal Revenue Code provisions.
Title
Clarifying the definition of an employee for the purposes of unemployment compensation and workers’ compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 118) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/8/19 |
2019-02-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-14 | House | To Industry and Labor then Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21A | 1A | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 2 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |