WV HB2439 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a simpler alternative for fire departments and fire companies to document their use of state funds for safety equipment and training, and to provide sanctions, including forfeiture of state money, for failure to provide required documentation or for spending state funds for improper uses. This bill also provides procedures for notification to the fire department or company that is subject to sanctions and to correct or contest determinations of improper expenditures. This bill has been recommended for introduction and passage by the Joint Committee on Volunteer Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services.
Title
Relating to fire service equipment and training funds for volunteer and part-volunteer fire companies
Sponsors
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] | Del. Tom Azinger [R] | Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] |
Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 350) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 205) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 205) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 350) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 205) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-05 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-01-15 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-15 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Government Organization |
2019-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB292 (Similar To) 2019-01-18 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 14b | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3 | 5f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 8b | Amended Code | Citation Text |