WV HB2673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt low volume oil and gas wells from severance tax, and to provide for a special use fee on sales from oil and gas wells which produce more than 5,000 cubic feet of natural gas or one-half barrel of oil per day but less than 60,000 cubic feet of natural gas or 10 barrels of oil per day. The special use fee shall be used by the Secretary of the Department of Environmental Protection to plug abandoned oil and gas wells.
Title
Creating the Oil and Gas Abandoned Well Plugging Fund
Sponsors
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] | Del. William Anderson [R] |
Del. John Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 710) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 173) (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 710) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 494) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Finance Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | EIM Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 173) |
2019-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-30 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Energy |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-25 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 29a | New Code | See Bill Text |