WV HB2811 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to delete obsolete provisions in the West Virginia Code regarding the Physician's Mutual Insurance Company, and to provide that the company need not be organized as a nonprofit corporation provided that the company remain a domestic mutual insurance company owned by its policyholders.
Title
Deleting obsolete provisions regarding the Physicians' Mutual Insurance Company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 253) (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 147, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/30/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-30 | House | To Governor 3/30/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/30/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 253) |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-18 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 20F | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |