WV HB3142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to thermal tax reduction on thermal or steam coal
Title
Relating to reducing the severance tax on thermal or steam coal
Sponsors
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] |
Del. Zachery Maynard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 706) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 469) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 468) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 372) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 371) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 354) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 469) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 468) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 372) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 371) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 354) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 706) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 469) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 468) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 372) |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion for previous question adopted (Roll No. 371) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 354) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13A | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |