WV HB4077 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 144, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 144, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is allow a dental hygienist to place dental sealants on a patients teeth without first having to have a dental examination by a licensed dentist.
Title
Relating to activities that may be performed by a dental hygienist without a prior exam by a dentist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 384) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 144, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 384) | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-09 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-07 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-06 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-03-01 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Passed House (Roll No. 152) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-02-13 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-13 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-01-16 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2012-01-16 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-16 | To Health and Human Resources then Finance | |
2012-01-16 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB187 (Same As) 2012-01-16 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 4 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |