WV HB4140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize an additional circuit court judge for the thirtieth judicial circuit consisting of Mingo county.
Title
Authorizing an additional circuit court judge for the thirtieth judicial circuit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-14 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - To Judiciary
SB475 (Similar To) 2014-02-03 - To Judiciary
SB557 (Similar To) 2014-02-12 - To Judiciary
SB475 (Similar To) 2014-02-03 - To Judiciary
SB557 (Similar To) 2014-02-12 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |