WV HB4299 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that nonstate retired employees who have worked for their last nonstate employer for less than five years are responsible for their entire premium cost for coverage.
Title
Providing that nonstate retired employees who have worked for their last nonstate employer for less than five years are responsible for their entire premium cost
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 144, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-19 | Approved by Governor 3/19/10 | |
2010-03-19 | Approved by Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 | |
2010-03-12 | House Message received | |
2010-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 249) | |
2010-03-11 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-10 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-09 | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-05 | Reported do pass, with amendments | |
2010-02-24 | To Finance | |
2010-02-24 | To Finance | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-23 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-23 | Passed House (Roll No. 65) | |
2010-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-23 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-22 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-19 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-02-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-02 | To House Banking and Insurance | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-02 | To Banking and Insurance then Finance | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Same As) 2010-03-02 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4299&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |