WV HB4648 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 52, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 52, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Supreme Court of Appeals to utilize current judicial officers and resources to implement a domestic violence court pilot project. Since this bill only utilizes current judicial officers and resources, it has no fiscal impact.
Title
Implementing a domestic violence court pilot project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 61) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 425) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 135) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 52, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 61) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 425) | |
2012-03-10 | Conference report received-House | |
2012-03-10 | Conference report filed - Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Conference report filed - House | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | To conference | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | House appointed conferees: Frazier, Ellem, Ferro | |
2012-03-10 | House agreed to conference | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-08 | Senate appoints conference committee: Wills, Kirkendoll, Nohe | |
2012-03-08 | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | House Message received | |
2012-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) | |
2012-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 12) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-02 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2012-02-29 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 135) | |
2012-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2012-02-20 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 27 | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 2A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |