WV HB4717 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to terminate the authority of the Purchasing Division to impose a certain annual fee upon vendors.
Title
Relating to terminating the authority of the Director of the Purchasing Division to impose a certain annual fee upon vendors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 191) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 190) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 190) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 191) |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 190) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2024-01-15 | House | To House Finance |
2024-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-15 | House | To Finance |
2024-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |