WV HB5262 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish the creation of a Teachers Bill of Rights. The bill defines the duties of counselors. The bill defines data to be provided. The bill defines the special education student to instructor ratio, a waiver process, and compensation given to a teacher when the ratio is exceeded. The bill provides for supplemental duty calendar provisions. The bill prohibits sanctions in certain instances. The bill provides resources, including liability insurance, for classroom teachers. The bill provides for teacher quality assistance. Finally, the bill clarifies the process for the removal of students.
Title
Relating generally to teacher’s bill of rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 773) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 516) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 516) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 166) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 248, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 773) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Fin. title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Edu. title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 516) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/8/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2024-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Education Committee amend. as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Finance amend. to Education comm. amend. adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Education Committee Amendment Reported |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2024-02-15 | Senate | To Education |
2024-02-15 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 166) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2024-02-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-29 | House | To House Education |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-29 | House | To Education |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 20 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5 | 18b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 2A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |