WV HCR19 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U. S. Marine Sgt. Stephen E. Drummond Memorial Bridge
Title
U. S. Marine Sgt. Stephen E. Drummond Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-02-15 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-21 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SCR13 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - To Transportation and Infrastructure