WV HCR66 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
U.S. Army SP4 Lonnie “Bill” Walker Memorial Bridge
Title
U.S. Army SP4 Lonnie “Bill” Walker Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-24 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-23 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2024-02-23 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Be adopted |
2024-02-21 | House | To House Rules |
2024-02-21 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |