WV HCR67 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Kenneth R. Lucas Memorial Bridge
Title
Kenneth R. Lucas Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2024-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-27 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2024-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-26 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-26 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Postponed on Unfinished Business, Special Calendar, until 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-23 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | Be adopted |
2024-02-21 | House | To House Rules |
2024-02-21 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |