WV SB10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the Board of Medicine, Board of Dental Examiners and the Board of Osteopathy to independently initiate disciplinary proceedings in certain circumstances.
Title
Permitting independent initiation of disciplinary proceedings by certain licensing boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-03-28 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 3) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-20 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 14 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 4 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |