WV SB1005 | 2013 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplementary appropriation from Civil Contingent Fund and Consumer Protection Fund
Title
Making supplementary appropriation from Civil Contingent Fund and Consumer Protection Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 493) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 492) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 491) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Constitutional Rule rejected (Roll No. 487) (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 492) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 491) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Constitutional Rule rejected (Roll No. 487) (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/23/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/23/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/23/13 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | To Governor 4/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/23/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 493) |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 492) |
2013-04-18 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 491) |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Constitutional Rule rejected (Roll No. 487) |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-17 | House | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-17 | House | Reference dispensed |
2013-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 5) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |