WV SB17 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-06 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-06 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase the amount of net terminal income allocated to the Cultural Facilities and Capitol Resources Matching Grant Program Fund.
Title
Increasing certain Cultural Facilities and Capitol Resources Matching Grant Program Fund allocations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | To House Finance | |
2009-04-06 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2009-04-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2009-04-01 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced in House | |
2009-04-01 | Ordered to House | |
2009-04-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading with right to amend | |
2009-04-01 | Unanimous consent | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | On 1st reading | |
2009-03-30 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2009-03-25 | To Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2009-02-11 | To Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-02-11 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=17&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |