WV SB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting certain employees of educational service cooperatives participate in state's teacher retirement systems
Title
Permitting certain employees of educational service cooperatives participate in state's teacher retirement systems
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 278) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 114) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 114) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/19 |
2019-03-01 | House | To Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | To Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 278) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-13 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-13 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 114) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Pensions |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Pensions |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2780 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 7A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |