WV SB609 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify DSRS surviving spouse benefits when member dies from duty or non-duty related cause, and to clarify how to compute a retiree's age when a member elected an early retirement and then returned to work.This bill was recommended for passage in the 2024 regular session of the Legislature by the Consolidated Public Retirement Board.
Title
Deputy Sheriff Retirement System Act
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Mark Hunt [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Pensions |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-31 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5267 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Chapter 75, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 14D | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 24A | Amended Code | Citation Text |