WV SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding certain crimes for which prosecutor may apply for wiretap
Title
Adding certain crimes for which prosecutor may apply for court order authorizing interception of communications
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 483) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 346) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 213) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 137) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 132) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 346) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 213) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 137) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 132) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Repassed House to meet the objections of the Governor (Roll No. 483) |
2019-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | House reconsidered its action |
2019-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate amended, repassed bill as result of Governor's Veto (Roll No. 346) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/5/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/1/19 |
2019-02-25 | House | To Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-25 | Senate | To Governor 2/25/19 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-19 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 213) |
2019-02-19 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2019-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 137) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 132) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-01-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 13) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/17/19 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2940 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1D | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1D | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |