WV SB632 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to continue the study group on competency and criminal responsibility, add brain injuries to the subjects to be studied, amend the membership of the study group, establish a steering committee within the study group, setting a deadline for the report to be presented and to which offices and committees the report should be submitted, and permitting the steering committee to seek funding.
Title
Relating to Dangerousness Assessment Advisory Board multi-disciplinary study group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 730) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 729) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 141) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 729) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 471) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 558) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 141) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/14/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 730) |
2024-03-09 | House | House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 729) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 471) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 471) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate concur in part; refuse concur in part; request House recede |
2024-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 559) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 558) |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 141) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 6A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |