WV SB635 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require approval of certain county and municipal fire ordinances and regulations by the West Virginia State Fire Commission.
Title
Requiring State Fire Commission approve certain county and municipal fire ordinances and regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 22) | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 286) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-10 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | To Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in House | |
2010-03-03 | Ordered to House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 40) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-26 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-22 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-22 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-22 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4635 (Similar To) 2010-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 5b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=635&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |