WV SB650 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplementary appropriation from General Revenue to DHHR--Division of Human Services
Title
Making supplementary appropriation from General Revenue to DHHR, Division of Human Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 307) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 306) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/15/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-09 | House Message received | |
2012-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 307) | |
2012-03-08 | Passed House (Roll No. 306) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-28 | To Finance | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-27 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-27 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 12) | |
2012-02-27 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) | |
2012-02-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-27 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-24 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-23 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-02-23 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-23 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-20 | To Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | To Finance | |
2012-02-20 | Filed for introduction |