WV SB664 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Decreasing appropriations of public moneys in State Fund, General Revenue
Title
Decreasing appropriations of public moneys in State Fund, General Revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] | Sen. Truman Chafin [D] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] |
Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 88) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 88) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 359) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 88) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 359) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/22/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/22/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/22/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/22/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-22 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 88) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 88) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 360) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 359) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-04 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | To Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 30) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 30) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |