WY HB0006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to physical therapy; modifying the scope of practice of physical therapists; making a conforming amendment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Physical therapy-scope of practice revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 12 | |
2019-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0018 | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0018 |
2019-02-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0018 |
2019-02-11 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0018 | |
2019-02-11 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-11 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |