WY HB0009 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fuel tax; providing for taxation of alternative fuel as specified; providing exemptions; providing for collection and distribution of the tax; requiring a decal for electric vehicles; requiring reporting as specified; providing rulemaking authority; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alternative fuel taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0025 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2015-02-18 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0025 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2015-02-17 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2015-01-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-19 | Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |