WY HB0114 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 74 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 74 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the personal opportunity with employment responsibilities (POWER) program; amending asset reporting requirements; amending allowable asset limitations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public assistance-eligibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 55-3-2-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 74 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0043 | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0043 | |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-10-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 | |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 55-3-2-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |