WY HB0117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; amending the minimum test requirements of a college entrance exam selected by the state superintendent; and providing for an effective date.
Title
College entrance exam-written component.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |