WY HB0121 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for nonresident five (5) day fishing licenses; exempting holders of such licenses from conservation stamp purchase requirement; providing for fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 119 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0071 | |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2017-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0071 |
2017-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0071 | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-07 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |