WY HB0128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - COW:Failed 20-37-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; providing a tax exemption for a portion of property owned by citizens aged sixty-five years of age and older; providing for application for the exemption; providing for calculation of the exemptions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senior property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - COW:Failed 20-37-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseCOW:Failed 20-37-3-0-0
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback