WY HB0148 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to law enforcement; providing railroad employees with law enforcement powers as specified; specifying the force that can be used; placing limitations on the exercise of authority; limiting the privileges and obligations available to railroad security officers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Railroad security officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H08; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0148.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0148.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0148.htm |