WY HB0162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-25 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to information sharing among governmental agencies; specifying minimum privacy and security requirements for sharing information; imposing oversight upon the department of enterprise technology services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Data exchange security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced and referred to H07; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0162.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0162.pdf |