WY HB0192 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; requiring photo identification to vote; making conforming amendments; repealing provisions related to proof of identity for voting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter fraud prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - COW:Passed 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - COW:Passed 30-29-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed 30-29-1-0-0
2019-01-29HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-29HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback