WY HB0212 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:Failed 27-35-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:Failed 27-35-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; requiring the legislature to establish standing committees; creating the standing committee on federal review; establishing powers and duties of the federal review committee; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Statutory standing committees-federal review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - COW:Failed 27-35-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:Failed 27-35-0-0-0 |
2023-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |