WY HB0243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; extending the expiration date for driver's licenses as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Danny Eyre [R] | Rep. Jamie Flitner [R] |
Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 172 | |
2019-02-28 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0108 | |
2019-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0108 |
2019-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0108 |
2019-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0108 | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-21 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-0-1-0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2019-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |