WY SF0006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works; requiring the adoption of prequalification requirements; allowing the use of equivalent materials or equipment as specified; amending qualification requirements; prohibiting unbalanced unit bid prices; requiring rulemaking; making conforming amendments; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Public works contracting requirements-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 3-4-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |