WY SF0032 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; prohibiting the use of unmanned aircraft systems as specified; authorizing the department of corrections to take reasonable actions against unmanned aircraft systems trespassing over or in penal institutions; providing definitions; providing penalties; providing exceptions; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Prohibiting drones over penal institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Failed 4-26-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-3-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Failed 4-26-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-3-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Assigned Chapter Number 131 | |
2023-02-28 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0067 | |
2023-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0067 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0067 |
2023-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0067 | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Concur:Recede from Non-Concurrence pursuant to JR 2-4 Passed by Roll Call 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Concur:Failed 4-26-1-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-1-0-0 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-16 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-06 | Bill Number Assigned |