WY SF0048 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal justice; amending provisions relating to sentencing, probation and parole; providing for probation for certain first time felony offenses; providing for confinement and treatment in an intensive substance abuse treatment unit as condition of probation or suspension of sentence; creating alternative procedures for addressing parole, probation and suspension of sentence violations; amending provisions relating to rewards and sanctions as an alternative to probation or parole revocations; amending the membership and powers and duties of the corrections board; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Criminal justice-reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Did Not Consider in COW |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-10 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-10 | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0048.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/SF0048.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0048.pdf |