WY SF0085 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to medical education; creating the medical education oversight council; specifying duties and authority of the council; limiting budget reductions and reallocations of funds appropriated for medical education programs implemented by the University of Wyoming as specified; providing for reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2016-02-29 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2016-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |