WY SF0089 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 101
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; increasing the amount of exemption for veterans for ad valorem taxation; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Veterans ad valorem exemption-amount.
Sponsors
Rep. Ocean Andrew [R] | Rep. Jon Conrad [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Sen. James Anderson [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Edward Cooper [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-0-0-5 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-0-0-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-2-0-0-4 (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 2-0-2-0-1 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 2-0-2-0-1 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-0-0-0-3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-0-0-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-2-0-0-4 (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 2-0-2-0-1 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 2-0-2-0-1 (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-0-0-0-3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 101 | |
2024-03-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0061 | |
2024-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2024-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0061 | |
2024-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-0-0-5 |
2024-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-03-05 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-29 | House | H08 - Transportation:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-29 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-0-0-3 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-2-0-0-4 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-22 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 2-0-2-0-1 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-0-0-0-3 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |