WY SF0099 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-43-6-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-43-6-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government royalty revenue; amending the definition of "special districts" for purposes of mineral royalty loans and grants; clarifying projects that are eligible for loans and grants; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mineral royalty grant and loan qualification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 11-43-6-0-0 (Y: 11 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 11-43-6-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-02 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2020-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-24 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |