WY SF0105 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; requiring customer allocation agreements for utility service to a customer in the certificated territory of another utility; authorizing a civil action and recovery for violations; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Utilities-point of consumption and allocation agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-24 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |