WY SF0107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to federal education dollars; requiring a study on the amount and impact of federal dollars received by this state for purposes of public education programs; specifying responsibility for the study; imposing reporting requirements; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Federal education funds study.
Sponsors
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SF0107.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/SF0107.pdf |