WY SJ0005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution relating to education; providing the general supervision of public schools shall be prescribed by law effective January 7, 2019; eliminating the elected state superintendent as an elected official on and after January 7, 2019; removing the state superintendent as an ex officio member of University of Wyoming board of trustees and from the board of land commissioners on and after January 7, 2019.
Title
State superintendent of public instruction-1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SJ0005.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/SJ0005.pdf |