WY SJ0010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to take action relating to management of federal lands to promote multiple uses of public lands and state involvement in federal resource management.
Title
Multiple use of public lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-6-4-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-6-4-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEJR No. 0002 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Speaker Signed SEJR No. 0002 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | President Signed SEJR No. 0002 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number SEJR No. 0002 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-6-4-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-02-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | :Rerefer to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |