AK HB116 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the use of credited military service by retired peace officers and firefighters to meet certain requirements for major medical insurance coverage; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pers Credit For Military Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/11/14 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 81 SLA 14 |
2014-07-03 | House | 9:46 AM 7/3 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-18 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 116(L&C) |
2014-04-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-18 | Senate | DYSON, BISHOP, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEDMAN, STEVENS, GARDNER, EGAN, KELLY, OLSON |
2014-04-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, ELLIS, |
2014-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 116(L&C) |
2014-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 116(L&C) |
2014-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR, GARA, DRUMMOND, GUTTENBERG, GRUENBERG |
2014-04-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-14 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2014-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 116(L&C) |
2014-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2014-04-10 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2014-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-10 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER, OLSON |
2014-04-10 | House | DP: MILLETT, JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-10 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 5NR |
2014-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2014-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, FEIGE |
2014-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS, HIGGINS |
2014-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, NAGEAK, P.WILSON, TUCK, HERRON |
2013-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON |
2013-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2013-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT |
2013-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA |
2013-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2013-02-13 | House | L&C, FIN |
2013-02-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |