AK HB206 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to motor vehicle service contracts; exempting motor vehicle service contracts from regulation as insurance; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor Vehicle Service Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 78 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-21 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-21 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1 |
2014-04-21 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-20 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 206(L&C) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 206(L&C) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14 |
2014-04-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-18 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2014-04-18 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2014-04-18 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | L&C |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 206(L&C) |
2014-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 206(L&C) |
2014-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-10 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2014-04-10 | House | DP: MILLETT |
2014-04-10 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 6NR |
2013-04-12 | House | L&C |
2013-04-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Occupations & Professions
Sales
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Insurance
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Occupations & Professions
Sales