AK HB210 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to crisis intervention training for school personnel; and relating to restraint and seclusion of students in public schools.
Title
Schools: Restraint, Seclusion, Crisis Trg
Sponsors
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Alan Austerman [R] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Neal Foster [D] |
Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] | Rep. David Guttenberg [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - House: CSHB 210(FIN) am Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - House: CSHB 210(FIN) am Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14 |
2014-07-17 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 95 SLA 14 |
2014-07-14 | House | 10:30 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-15 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 210(FIN) AM |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-19 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-19 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-19 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-18 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/18 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR |
2014-04-18 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2014-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(FIN) AM |
2014-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, OLSON |
2014-04-15 | Senate | DP: MEYER, HOFFMAN |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT 2DP 5NR |
2014-04-11 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | AM: GARDNER |
2014-04-11 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, STEDMAN, HUGGINS |
2014-04-11 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1AM |
2014-04-08 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2014-04-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 210(FIN) AM |
2014-04-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, TARR |
2014-04-07 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 210(FIN) AM |
2014-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-07 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-07 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2014-03-27 | House | COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-27 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, T.WILSON, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, GARA, |
2014-03-27 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP |
2014-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, GUTTENBERG |
2014-03-18 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2014-03-18 | House | AM: P.WILSON |
2014-03-18 | House | NR: REINBOLD, KITO III |
2014-03-18 | House | DP: SADDLER, SEATON, GATTIS |
2014-03-18 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 3DP 2NR 1AM |
2014-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2014-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-01-21 | House | EDC, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |